Pallister, Crystal (CPSO#: 71206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-9240
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pallister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pallister ( CPSO# 71206 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL PALLISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002