Pallopson, Priit (CPSO#: 21381)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priit Pallopson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013