Palmares, Xerma Kennedy Deoclecio (CPSO#: 108278)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Escola de Med da Santa Casa de Mise de V, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 24 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017