Palmer, David Douglas (CPSO#: 73404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Amica at Erin Mills
4620 Kimbermount Ave
Mississauga ON  L5M 5W5
Canada
Phone: 905-816-9163
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Palmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Palmer ( CPSO# 73404 )

Business Address:
Amica at Erin Mills
4620 Kimbermount Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 5W5
Phone Number: (905) 816-9163

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
Suite 8
5425 Creditview Road South
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DOUGLAS PALMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001