Palmgren, Elisabeth (CPSO#: 26206)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Swedish

Education:Royal Caroline Medico-Surgical Institute, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013