Palumbo, John Vincent (CPSO#: 58366)

Current Status: Suspended as of 19 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 May 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 19 Mar 2013


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 17 May 2011 Active View Details [+]
 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 16 Jul 2012
Summary:

 On July 16, 2012, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. John Vincent Palumbo is 
 incapacitated, as defined in s.1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On March 19, 2013, 
 the Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar suspend Dr. Palumbo's certificate of 
 registration on an indefinite basis, with the proviso that he may apply for reinstatement, with 
 supporting evidence, in the future if he wishes to do so.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 11, 2012