Palumbo, Nicole Marie (CPSO#: 86364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Clarkson Road North
Mississauga ON  L5J 2W4
Phone: (905) 822-9171
Fax: (905) 823-3990
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Palumbo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Palumbo ( CPSO# 86364 )

Business Address:
1265 Clarkson Road North
Mississauga ON  L5J 2W4
Phone Number: (905) 822-9171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE PALUMBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALUMBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009