Pan, Ming (CPSO#: 83217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French, Mandarin

Education:Tianjin Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pan ( CPSO# 83217 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MING PAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009