Panabaker, James Paul (CPSO#: 17894)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Panabaker has advised that his medical records were turned over to his colleagues at: Georgetown Medical Associates 1A Princess Anne Halton Hills, ON L7G 4N4 The remaining medical records were sent to: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 Toll free: 1-888-563-3732 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Jul 2013


Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: Huron Shores FHT 527 Causley Street Blind River, ON P0R 1B0
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013