Panagiotopoulos, Constadina (CPSO#: 68884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 28 Feb 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998