Pancham, Paul Ian (CPSO#: 67728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4312
Fax: (905) 721-3558
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Pancham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pancham ( CPSO# 67728 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Toronto ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4312

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Ian Pancham, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pancham to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. PAUL PANCHAM
                                          ("Dr. Pancham")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pancham, certificate of registration number 67728, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214769 (the "Investigation") into my conduct and
                  practice at Lakeridge Health Oshawa.

            (4)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken
                  on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Return to Work Agreement with Lakeridge Health 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that I have entered into an agreement
                        with Lakeridge Health setting out terms for my return to work and
                        dated July 13, 2016 (the "Return to Work Agreement") which is
                        attached to, and forms part of, this Undertaking as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake to fully comply with the Return to Work
                        Agreement. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pancham, agree that in the event that I fail to fully comply
                        with my Return to Work Agreement, such action may constitute a
                        breach of this Undertaking and an act of professional misconduct.
                  
            (7)   Workplace Reporting 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge and agree that the person who is the
                        Chief of Obstetrics and Gynecology at Lakeridge Health will be
                        required to execute an undertaking in the form attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B".  I have reviewed this undertaking and understand what
                        is required of the Chief  of Obstetrics and Gynecology which
                        includes, without limiting the generality of the foregoing:
                  
                        i.    a report to the College regarding my completion of the Peer
                              Monitoring phase set out in the Return to Work Agreement;
                  
                        ii.   a report to the College regarding my completion to date of
                              the Supervised Independent Work phase set out in the Return
                              to Work Agreement;
                  
                        iii.  a report to the College regarding my completion of the
                              Supervised Independent Work phase set out in the Return to
                              Work Agreement;
                  
                        iv.   a report to the College one year after my completion of the
                              Supervised Independent Work phase set out in the Return to
                              Work Agreement;
                  
                        v.    such reports to include information regarding my clinical
                              skills, behaviour, conduct, communications and
                              professionalism, whether observed by him or her, or as
                              reported to him or her by nursing, midwifery, and/or medical
                              staff; and
                  
                        vi.   immediate reporting to the College if he or she has any
                              concerns: about my clinical skills, behaviour, conduct,
                              communications or professionalism; about my capacity to
                              practise medicine; that my patients may be at risk of harm or
                              injury; or that I am not in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   PHP Contract

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that I have entered into a contract
                        with the PHP dated June 23, 2016 ("PHP Contract") which is attached
                        to, and forms part of, this Undertaking as Appendix "C".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake to remain a participant in the PHP, and
                        to fully comply with the requirements of the PHP Contract. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pancham, agree that in the event that I terminate my
                        relationship with the PHP, or if I fail to fully comply with my PHP
                        Contract, such action may constitute a breach of this Undertaking,
                        and an act of professional misconduct. 
                  
            (9)   Delivery of reports mandated under PHP Contract

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake to obtain copies of all of the reports
                        set out below and, within seven (7) days of receiving the reports,
                        to provide copies of the reports to the College:
                  
                        i.    PULSE survey results and feedback reports (two per year);
                  
                        ii.   Reports of Dawn Martin to the PHP (quarterly reports over a
                              twelve-month period); and
                  
                        iii.  Reports of the PHP to Lakeridge Health (semi-annually over
                              the term of the PHP contract).  
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pancham, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pancham, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Pancham's
                              conduct and practice at Lakeridge Health Oshawa.  As a result
                              of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Pancham will comply with the terms of his Return to
                                    Work Agreement with Lakeridge Health. 
                  
                              *     The Chief of Obstetrics and Gynecology at Lakeridge
                                    Health will provide periodic reports to the College
                                    about Dr. Pancham.
                  
                              *     Dr. Pancham will comply with the terms of his PHP
                                    Contract.
                  
                              *     Dr. Pancham will provide the College with copies of
                                    certain reports mandated under his PHP Contract.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Pancham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my compliance with the Return to Work Agreement
                  and/or PHP Contract:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Pancham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Pancham, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my compliance with the Return to Work Agreement and/or PHP Contract, and
                  to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another,
                  any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Return to Work Agreement set out
                        at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the provisions of the Chief of Obstetrics and
                        Gynecology's undertaking set out at Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (d)   relevant to the provisions of the PHP Contract set out at Appendix
                        "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (e)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (f)   which comes to their attention and which they reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Ian Pancham to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Pancham’s conduct and practice at Lakeridge Health Oshawa. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Pancham will comply with the terms of his Return to Work Agreement with Lakeridge Health.

The Chief of Obstetrics and Gynecology at Lakeridge Health will provide periodic reports to the College about Dr. Pancham.

Dr. Pancham will comply with the terms of his PHP Contract

Dr. Pancham will provide the College with copies of certain reports mandated under his PHP Contract.