Panchanathan, Sarada Soumya (CPSO#: 57147)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: Gopinathan, Sarada Soumya (used until: 12 Oct 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005