Panday, Khaimchand (CPSO#: 68632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998