Pandes, Michael Sayat (CPSO#: 75059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 508-5911
Fax: (905) 508-2972
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Pandes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dev ( CPSO# 76598 )
Dr. M. Pandes ( CPSO# 75059 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-5911


Corporation Name: Dr. Shelly Dev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dev ( CPSO# 76598 )
Dr. M. Pandes ( CPSO# 75059 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
D-112- 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAYAT PANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004