Pandeya, Sanjaya (CPSO#: 69273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 710
700 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V3
Phone: 905-815-9283
Fax: 905-815-9492
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4100 Upper Middle Rd.
Burlington ON  L7M 4W8
Canada
Phone: 905-815-9283
Fax: 905-815-9492
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 338-4354
Fax: (905) 338-4355
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3730
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjaya Pandeya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pandeya ( CPSO# 69273 )

Business Address:
710 - 700 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V3

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
4100 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4W8
Phone Number: (905) 815-9283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAYA PANDEYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999