Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Pandhi, Hemant Manilal (CPSO#: 57959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Apr 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Gujarat University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 678-7324
Fax: (905) 678-7145
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pandhi ( CPSO# 57959 )

Business Address:
108 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 678-7324

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Apr 2001

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2001 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April  2,  2001,  Dr. Hemant M. Pandhi is limited to general practice
            pending an assessment agreeable  to  the  Registrar  confirming that Dr. Pandhi
            displays the knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to
            practise emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment..

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Apr 2001
Summary:

On April 2, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pandhi s guilty plea and found him 
guilty of: 
 
(1)   engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
      all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
      dishonourable or unprofessional in that he; 
 
      (i)   failed to advise the College that there were disciplinary actions pending against 
            him by the licensing authority in the State of New York; 
 
      (ii)   advised the College that he had not entered into an agreement with a licensing 
            authority in the face of potential disciplinary action by the authority, when this 
            was not a true or accurate statement. 
 
(2)   in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has 
      found Dr. Pandhi committed an act of professional misconduct;  
 
(3)   in that the governing body of a  health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has 
      made a finding of professional misconduct or a similar finding against Dr. Pandhi.  
 
The Committee directed the following penalty: 
 
(1)   recorded reprimand; 
 
(2)   that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of three months, 
      commencing January 10, 2001 until April 10, 2001; 
 
(3)   the Registrar is directed to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Pandhi s certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   that Dr. Pandhi s certificate of registration be limited to general practice pending 
            an assessment agreeable to the Registrar confirming that Dr. Pandhi displays the 
            knowledge, skill and judgement that demonstrates that he is fit to practice 
            emergency room medicine, except as required by the assessment. 
 
(4)   that Dr. Pandhi pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000, to be paid no later than 
      June 30, 2001; 
 
(5)   the Registrar is directed to register the result of any successful appeal by Dr. Pandhi of the 
      Determination and Order of the State Board for Professional Medical Conduct in the 
      State of New York in the matter of Hemant Pandhi, M.D. made September 22, 2000. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 02, 2001