Pandit, Rajani Venkatesh (CPSO#: 78727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 3310
Fax: (613) 938-4075
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Pandit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pandit ( CPSO# 78727 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJANI VENKATESH PANDIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008