Pandith, Vikas (CPSO#: 64166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2119 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone: (905) 6623303
Fax: (905) 6623304
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Pandith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Pandith ( CPSO# 64166 )

Business Address:
2119 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS PANDITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992