Pandya, Anand Hasmukh (CPSO#: 84808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 497-4708
Fax: (905) 497-5709
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand Hasmukh Pandya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pandya ( CPSO# 84808 )

Business Address:
213 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 497-4708

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAND HASMUKH PANDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2007