Pandya, Sudhir Prataprai (CPSO#: 62782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#301
Peterborough clinic
26 hospital drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: 705-740-6878
Fax: 705-740-6899
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sudhir Pandya Medicine Professional Coporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHIR PRATAPRAI PANDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015