Panesar, Jarnail Singh (CPSO#: 59779)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000