Pang, Benjamin Jong-Ming (CPSO#: 108521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2016

Expiry Date:  15 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
Division of Adult Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-5000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JONG-MING PANG may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PANG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. PANG ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. PANG ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 15 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Feb 2016 to 12 Apr 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Feb 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2018