Pang, Jeffrey Tsun Wai (CPSO#: 67958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A235
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4752
Fax: (416) 480-4912
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Jubilee Square
Unit L7
280 West Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-3690
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey T. W. Pang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pang ( CPSO# 67958 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
Room A235
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4752

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY TSUN WAI PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998