Pangilinan Jr, Ben Laxamana (CPSO#: 79712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L L 58
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 707-8707
Fax: (905) 707-7018
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pangilinan Jr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pangilinan Jr ( CPSO# 79712 )

Business Address:
Lower Level 58
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 707-8707

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEN LAXAMANA PANGILINAN JR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANGILINAN JR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005