Panisko, Daniel Michael (CPSO#: 54216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1985


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital/UHN
Div Of General Internal Medicine
Suite 421 - 8 East
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5824
Fax: (416) 603-6495
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DANIEL MICHAEL PANISKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANISKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985