Panjwani, Dilip Dhanjibhai (CPSO#: 57902)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 1987 to 16 Mar 1987
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2011