Panos, Anthony (CPSO#: 32581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Mississippi Medical Ctr
2500 North State Street
Dept of Surgery
Jackson MS  39216
United States
Phone: (601)984-5489
Fax: (601)984-5872

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Mississippi

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY PANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981