Pantazi, Sophia (CPSO#: 57183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5279
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: P.Stroz & S.Pantazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. S. Pantazi ( CPSO# 57183 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5279

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3,4,5
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 751-1550

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Suite 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA PANTAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANTAZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988