Panter, Katerine Ruth (CPSO#: 67535)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1996