Papa, Fabio de Vasconcelos (CPSO#: 90082)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2011