Papadopoulos, Yasmin Anna (CPSO#: 85710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universita Palackeho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 302
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 445-9673
Fax: (416) 445-9388
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fieldstone Commons LTC
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Canada
Phone: (416) 445-9673
Fax: (416) 445-9388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasmin Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 85710 )

Business Address:
One Medical Place
302 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 445-9673

Business Address:
Leisureworld
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Phone Number: (416) 291-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMIN ANNA PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Jan 2009 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009