Papaioannou, Alexandra (CPSO#: 59396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 12294
Fax: (905) 526-2062
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 501
25 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 529-1317
Fax: (905) 521-1297
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Papaioannou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Papaioannou ( CPSO# 59396 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
Juravinski Research Centre
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PAPAIOANNOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPAIOANNOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1989