Papanikolaou, Frank Fotios (CPSO#: 71144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-3363
Fax: (905) 607-3079
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Papanikolaou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Papanikolaou ( CPSO# 71144 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
410-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 607-3363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK FOTIOS PAPANIKOLAOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPANIKOLAOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002