Papantony, Mary (CPSO#: 22227)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Alexandria, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1998