Papastergiou, Thanos (CPSO#: 70274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1824 Concession Dr
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X 1C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 284-1330
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Papastergiou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Papastergiou ( CPSO# 70274 )

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-7111

Business Address:
267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 284-1330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THANOS PAPASTERGIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPASTERGIOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999