Papillon, Jacques (CPSO#: 56301)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 1988