Papineau, Martin (CPSO#: 72409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone: (705) 362-7511
Fax: (705) 362-7161
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Papineau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Papineau ( CPSO# 72409 )

Business Address:
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-7511

Business Address:
Hopital Notre-Dame
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN PAPINEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPINEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2001