Papneja, Neha (CPSO#: 108191)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2016 to 27 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2016 to 28 Aug 2016
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2016