Papneja, Netee (CPSO#: 91243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aviva Medical Specialists Clinic
Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Aviva Medical Specialists Clinic
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line 2nd Floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

414 Victoria Ave North Suite M6
Hamilton ON  L8L5G8
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Papneja ( CPSO# 91243 )
Dr. V. Jain ( CPSO# 82491 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Site
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NETEE PAPNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPNEJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014