Papneja, Tripti (CPSO#: 84778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 799-1850
Fax: (905) 799-3819
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tripti Papneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Papneja ( CPSO# 84778 )

Business Address:
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 799-1850

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Papneja's medical records can be obtained by contacting her office at 905 799 1850.
Date Received: 25 Jul 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRIPTI PAPNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPNEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2011 to 06 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011