Papoff, Paul Morton (CPSO#: 28879)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017