Pappas, Stephen Chris (CPSO#: 30767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2004