Papsin, Blake Croll (CPSO#: 59729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6558
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blake C. Papsin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Papsin ( CPSO# 59729 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
555 University Avenue
Room 6117
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAKE CROLL PAPSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPSIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1989