Papworth, David Peter (CPSO#: 67199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
University of Iowa
200 Hawkins Drive
Iowa City IA  52242-1079
United States
Phone: (319) 356-2633

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - Iowa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PETER PAPWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPWORTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993