Paquin-Gobeil, Melanie (CPSO#: 91692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office Location
170-1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: 613-596-5093
Fax: 613-225-3652
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanie Paquin-Gobeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Paquin-Gobeil ( CPSO# 91692 )

Business Address:
1130 Morrison Drive
Suite 170
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 596-5093

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE PAQUIN-GOBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAQUIN-GOBEIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014