Paradis, Christian (CPSO#: 72874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone: (519) 631-5670
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian Paradis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paradis ( CPSO# 72874 )

Business Address:
301 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone Number: (519) 631-5679

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN PARADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000