Paradis, Josee Anne (CPSO#: 88587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Site
Dept of Otolaryngology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8794
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josee Paradis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paradis ( CPSO# 88587 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 685-8294

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8794

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Site
Department of Otolaryngology
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B3-440
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE ANNE PARADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014