Paradis, Rachelle Louise (CPSO#: 51354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-8391
Fax: (705) 673-7330
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachelle Paradis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Paradis ( CPSO# 51354 )

Business Address:
401 - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 673-8391

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE LOUISE PARADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1987