Parai, Jacqueline Louise (CPSO#: 67957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anatomical Pathology
The Ottawa Hospital - General site
501 Smyth Road, Box 117
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8996
Fax: (613) 737-8619
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE LOUISE PARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000