Parai, Mira Rani (CPSO#: 67455)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2013